Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/16/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/16/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/16/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/28/2000