Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/16/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/14/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/14/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/14/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/23/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/23/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/23/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/23/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/23/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/23/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/23/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 03/28/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/28/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/28/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/05/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/05/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/05/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/05/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/05/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/10/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/10/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/10/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/10/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/10/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/13/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/03/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/03/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/03/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/03/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/15/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/15/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/15/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/15/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/15/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/15/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/15/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/15/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/15/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/25/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/25/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/25/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/25/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/25/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/08/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/08/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/08/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/08/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/08/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/19/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/19/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/19/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/19/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/21/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/21/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/21/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/29/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/29/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/12/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/12/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/20/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/20/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/25/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/25/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/25/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/12/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/19/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/19/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/19/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/19/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/14/2000