Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/29/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/29/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/29/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/01/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/01/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/01/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/01/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/01/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/01/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/30/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/30/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/30/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/06/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/06/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/13/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/04/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/19/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/19/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/19/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/19/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/19/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/25/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/25/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/25/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/25/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/25/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/25/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/09/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/09/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/09/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/09/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/09/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/09/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/09/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/09/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/09/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/09/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/09/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/09/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/09/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/15/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/15/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/15/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/15/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/15/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/15/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/15/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/15/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/15/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/23/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/23/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/23/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/23/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/23/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/23/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/10/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/10/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/13/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/13/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/13/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/20/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/20/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/20/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/27/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/07/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/07/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/07/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/19/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/19/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/19/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/28/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/28/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/28/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/12/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/12/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/17/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/17/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/23/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 12/06/2000