Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/09/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/09/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/11/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2000