Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/01/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/09/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/21/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/28/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/03/2000