Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/02/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/02/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/09/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/09/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/11/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/11/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/25/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/25/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/25/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/25/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/25/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/25/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/04/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/04/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/04/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/16/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/16/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 03/25/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/13/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/13/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/13/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/13/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/05/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/05/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/18/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/30/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/21/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/01/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2000