There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Wire Transfer Fairness and Disclosure Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Electronic Fund Transfer Act to require additional disclosures relating to exchange rates in transfers involving international transactions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/19/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/12/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
01/19/1999Referred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/19/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/04/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/04/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/04/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/04/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/04/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/04/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/04/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/04/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/23/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/23/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/23/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/23/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/23/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/02/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/02/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/02/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/02/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/20/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/20/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/04/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/13/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/13/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/15/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/30/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 08/03/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/05/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/05/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/08/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/08/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/24/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/24/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/19/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/19/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/19/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/19/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/28/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/28/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/28/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/28/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/28/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/28/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/28/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/09/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/09/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/10/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/10/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/16/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 11/16/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/17/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/17/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/31/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/02/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services01/19/1999 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit02/12/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.382.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.382. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/19/1999)

Wire Transfer Fairness and Disclosure Act of 1999- Amends the Electronic Fund Transfer Act to require a financial institution or money transmitting business initiating an international money transfer on behalf of a consumer to disclose prominently on its premises and on its forms and receipts: (1) the exchange rate used in the transaction; (2) the exchange rate prevailing at a major financial center of the pertinent foreign country as of close of business on the business day immediately preceding the transaction date; and (3) all commissions and fees charged in such transaction.

Requires such information to be: (1) included in print, broadcast, and electronic advertisements; and (2) in English and in the same language as principally used by the institution or money transmitting business to advertise, solicit, or negotiate at that office if other than English.