Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/23/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/23/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/25/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/25/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/25/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/12/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/12/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/12/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/12/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/12/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/14/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/14/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/15/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/15/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/15/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/15/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/26/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/26/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/04/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/04/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/04/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/26/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/07/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/29/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/26/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/28/1999