Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/08/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/08/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/14/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/14/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/14/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/10/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/10/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/10/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/10/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/10/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/02/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/12/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/13/2000