Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/17/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/08/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/25/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/26/2000