Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/09/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/21/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/07/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/09/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/09/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/09/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/09/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/17/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/10/2000