Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/21/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/04/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/04/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/10/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/10/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/12/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/02/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/02/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/08/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/08/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/08/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/08/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/08/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/08/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/08/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/15/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/15/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/15/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/19/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/23/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/12/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/12/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/12/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/12/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/12/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/12/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/12/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/12/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/19/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/19/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/29/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/12/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 07/18/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/25/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/26/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/12/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/12/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/12/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/12/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/26/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/26/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/12/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/12/2000