Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/14/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/14/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/14/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/16/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/16/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/16/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/16/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/21/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/21/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/22/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/22/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/22/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/22/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/22/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/22/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/23/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/23/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/28/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/28/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/28/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/30/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/04/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/06/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/10/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/10/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/11/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/12/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/12/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/12/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/12/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/13/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/02/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/04/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/04/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/04/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/08/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/08/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/08/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/08/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/08/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/08/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/09/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/11/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/11/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/15/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/15/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/15/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/15/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/15/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/15/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/16/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/16/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/16/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/17/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/17/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/17/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/17/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/17/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/18/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/18/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/18/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/18/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/18/2000
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/18/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/18/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/18/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/18/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/18/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/19/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/19/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/19/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/19/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/19/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/22/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/22/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/22/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/22/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2000