Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/04/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/04/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/04/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/04/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/11/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/11/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/04/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/04/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/04/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/25/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/25/1999