Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/15/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/15/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/16/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/16/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/16/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/21/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/21/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/23/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/23/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/29/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/29/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/29/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/29/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/04/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/04/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/04/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/05/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/06/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/10/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/10/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/02/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/22/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/24/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/24/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/24/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/24/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/24/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/25/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/27/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/11/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/11/2000