Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/09/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/09/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/09/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/09/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/09/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/09/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/09/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/09/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/11/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/11/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/11/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/11/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/23/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/23/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/24/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/24/1999