Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/16/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/22/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/22/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/23/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/23/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/29/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/29/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/29/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/06/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/24/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/18/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew