Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/16/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/11/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/25/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/07/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/13/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/13/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/23/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/23/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/25/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2000