Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/21/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/29/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/16/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/07/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/07/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/07/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/07/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/13/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/14/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/14/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/14/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/21/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/21/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/26/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/26/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/28/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/10/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/26/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2000