Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/21/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/03/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/18/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/18/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/24/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/09/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/09/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/13/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/13/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/27/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/18/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/20/2000