Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/02/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/02/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/11/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/11/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 03/02/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/02/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/02/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/02/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/18/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/12/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/12/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/26/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/26/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/26/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/26/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/13/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/13/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/19/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/19/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/25/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/14/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/14/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/14/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/16/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/16/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/20/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/20/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/20/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/20/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/26/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/29/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/30/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 08/03/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/04/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 08/04/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/04/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/04/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/15/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/15/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/22/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/01/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/06/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/21/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/21/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/15/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/20/2000