There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

IDEA Full Funding Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize appropriations for part B of the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act to achieve full funding for part B of that Act by 2010.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/03/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 3 (Roll no. 140).(text: CR H2449)
03/22/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/04/2000SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/03/2000-4:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/03/2000-4:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 3 (Roll no. 140). (text: CR H2449)
05/03/2000-4:04pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2467-2468)
05/03/2000-2:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/03/2000-1:34pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4055.
05/03/2000-1:34pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2449-2457)
05/03/2000-1:34pmHouseMr. Goodling moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/12/2000HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/12/2000HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/22/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
03/22/2000HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E386)
03/22/2000HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/22/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/30/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/30/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/30/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/30/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/30/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/30/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/30/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/30/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/30/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/30/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/30/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/30/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/30/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/30/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/30/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/02/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/02/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/02/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/02/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/02/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/02/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/22/2000 Referred to
04/12/2000 Markup by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/04/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4055. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2000)

IDEA Full Funding Act of 2000 - Amends the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA) to authorize funding to reach the Federal Government's goal of providing 40 percent of the national average per pupil expenditure to assist States and local educational agencies with the excess costs of educating children with disabilities.

Authorizes appropriations for IDEA part B programs of assistance for education of all children with disabilities, in specified amounts for FY 2001 through 2010, and as necessary thereafter.