Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/22/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/22/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/28/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/28/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/28/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/28/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/28/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/28/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/28/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/28/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/28/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/29/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/04/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/04/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/15/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/25/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/25/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/25/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/25/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/25/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/25/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/15/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/29/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/29/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/29/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/29/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/13/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/13/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/13/2000