Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/22/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/10/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/10/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/10/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/11/2000
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/11/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/11/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/11/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/11/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/12/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/12/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/12/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/12/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/12/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/12/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/12/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/12/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/13/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/22/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/19/2000