Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/23/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/23/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/23/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/28/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/28/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/28/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/28/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/28/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/28/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 03/28/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/28/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/28/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/29/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/03/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/03/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/03/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/05/2000
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/05/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/10/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/10/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/11/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/11/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/11/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/11/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/16/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/16/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/18/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/14/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/14/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/14/2000