Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/11/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/11/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/11/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/24/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/24/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/24/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 02/24/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/24/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/25/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/25/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/25/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/25/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/25/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/25/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/25/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/25/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/25/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/25/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/10/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/10/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/15/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/28/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/28/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/28/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/13/2000