Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/23/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/28/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/28/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/28/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/11/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/11/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/11/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/11/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/11/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/16/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/16/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/16/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/16/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/19/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/08/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/08/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/25/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/25/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/25/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/05/2000