Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/24/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew