Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/28/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/28/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/02/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/04/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/19/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/28/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/29/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/12/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/27/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/27/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/2000