Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/29/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/10/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/13/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/13/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/13/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/13/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/29/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/29/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/27/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/13/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/13/2000