Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/02/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/02/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/02/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/09/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/09/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/09/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/09/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/09/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/09/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/09/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/02/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 03/02/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/11/1999