Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/19/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/11/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/11/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/11/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/11/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/11/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/11/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/11/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/11/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/23/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/23/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/23/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/23/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/23/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/23/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/23/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/23/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/23/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/23/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/23/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/20/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/20/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/20/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/20/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/20/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/20/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/20/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/20/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/20/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/03/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/03/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/03/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/06/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/19/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/19/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/19/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/19/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/19/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/19/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/19/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/19/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/08/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/30/1999