Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/10/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/10/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/18/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/12/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/12/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/13/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/21/2000