Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/03/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/03/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/03/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/03/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/03/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/03/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/03/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/03/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/03/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/09/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/09/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/09/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/09/2000
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/09/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/09/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/09/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/15/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/22/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/27/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/27/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/27/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/27/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/29/2000