Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/04/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/04/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/13/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/13/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/09/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/09/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/24/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/08/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/14/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/18/2000