Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/19/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/19/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 01/19/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/19/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/19/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/02/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/09/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/09/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 02/11/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/02/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/03/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/18/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/13/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/15/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/21/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/21/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/27/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/12/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/13/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/07/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/08/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/09/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/1999