Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/06/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/06/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/06/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/11/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/11/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/11/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/11/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/11/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/13/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/13/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/02/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/03/2000