Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/05/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/04/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/04/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/16/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/16/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/26/2000