There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FDA Tobacco Authority Amendments Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to tobacco products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/03/2000Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2503-2505)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
04/06/2000Referred to the House Committee on Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (97)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/06/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/06/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/10/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/10/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/10/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/11/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/11/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/11/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/11/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/11/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/12/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/12/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/13/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/13/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/13/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/02/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/02/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/02/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/08/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/08/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/08/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/08/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/08/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/08/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/08/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/16/2000
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/16/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/21/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/21/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/21/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/29/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/18/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/18/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/19/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/25/2000

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Commerce04/06/2000 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/17/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4207.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4207. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2000)

FDA Tobacco Authority Amendments Act - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to, among other things: (1) include "nicotine in a tobacco product" in the definition of the term "drug" and to include "a tobacco product" in the definition of the term "device;" and (2) set forth provisions for tobacco products concerning special standards for such products, warnings regarding such products, and a rule of construction regarding farmers and related entities.