Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 05/03/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/03/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/03/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/18/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/18/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/18/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/18/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/24/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/25/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/25/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/12/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/15/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/21/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/21/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/28/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/28/2000