There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Consumer Mortgage Protection Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide expanded substantive protections for especially vulnerable consumers against abusive mortgage lending practices and to streamline the framework regulating mortgage originations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/06/2000Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/06/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
04/06/2000Referred to the House Committee on Banking and Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2000Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Action By: Committee on Banking and Financial Services
04/06/2000Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/04/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/08/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/20/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/20/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/26/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/28/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/11/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/13/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/27/2000
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/04/2000 09/19/2000 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking and Financial Services04/06/2000 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit04/06/2000 Referred to
House Banking and Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity04/06/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4213.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4213. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2000)

Consumer Mortgage Protection Act of 2000 - Amends the Truth in Lending Act to: (1) reformulate annual percentage rates and total points and fees in connection with certain credit transactions secured by to the consumer's principal dwelling (high-cost mortgage); (2) repeal disclosure requirements with respect to prepayment penalties; (3) revise requirements for permissible prepayment penalties; (4) prohibit mandatory prepaid payments on such mortgages; (5) place limitations upon the charging of closing costs; and (6) proscribe creditor encouragement of consumer's default.

(Sec. 3) Requires a creditor to report a consumer's mortgage payment history to a nationally recognized credit bureau at least quarterly.

Prohibits creditor profit from the sale at foreclosure of property securing a high-cost mortgage.

Requires a high-cost mortgage creditor to respond within three business days to a request for a written statement setting forth the amounts necessary to fully satisfy the debt obligation.

Redraws creditor liability guidelines.

(Sec. 4) Amends the Real Estate Settlement Procedures Act to revise guidelines for: (1) standard Federal forms for the statement of settlement costs; and (2) information booklets that advise the consumer of certain sources of mortgage broker compensation.

(Sec. 5) Establishes Federal preemption of State law concerning subject matter under this Act. Empowers the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System to interpret Federal preemption issues under this Act.