Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/04/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/10/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/24/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/08/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/13/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/20/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/20/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/26/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/26/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/28/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/28/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2000
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/24/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/11/2000
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/13/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/19/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/12/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/27/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew