Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/06/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/02/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/02/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/04/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/04/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/08/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/08/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/08/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/08/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 05/11/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/11/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/17/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/23/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/06/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2000