Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/12/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/03/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/03/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/04/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/04/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/10/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/17/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/18/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/18/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/23/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 06/29/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/10/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/11/2000
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/18/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/19/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/20/2000
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/24/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/25/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/14/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/19/2000
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/26/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/27/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/30/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/02/2000