Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 04/06/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 04/06/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/11/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/11/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/11/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/13/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/04/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/04/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/04/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/04/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/04/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/04/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/23/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/23/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/23/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/06/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/06/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/13/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/13/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/13/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/13/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/13/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/20/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/20/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/20/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/20/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/27/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/27/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/27/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/11/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/11/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/11/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/11/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/11/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/11/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/17/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/2000
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/17/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/17/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/25/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/25/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/25/2000
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/25/2000
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/27/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 07/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/07/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/28/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/10/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/10/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/30/2000