Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/11/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/11/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/11/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/11/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/11/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/23/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2000