Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 04/12/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/04/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/06/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/12/2000