Text: H.R.4247 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2000)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF.

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 4247 Introduced in House (IH)]







106th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 4247

 To authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2001 for certain maritime 
 programs of the Department of Transportation, and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             April 12, 2000

     Mr. Bateman (for himself and Mr. Underwood) (both by request) 
 introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on 
                             Armed Services

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
 To authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2001 for certain maritime 
 programs of the Department of Transportation, and for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Maritime Administration 
Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2001''.

SEC. 2. AUTHORIZATION OF APPROPRIATIONS FOR FISCAL YEAR 2001.

    Funds are hereby authorized to be appropriated, as appropriations 
Acts may provide, for the use of the Department of Transportation for 
the Maritime Administration as follows:
            (1) For expenses necessary for operations and training 
        activities, not to exceed $80,240,000 for the fiscal year 
        ending September 30, 2001.
            (2) For the costs, as defined in section 502 of the Federal 
        Credit Reform Act of 1990, of guaranteed loans authorized by 
        title XI of the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 (46 App. U.S.C. 1271 
        et seq.), $2,000,000, to be available until expended. In 
        addition, for administrative expenses related to loan guarantee 
        commitments under title XI of the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 (46 
        App. U.S.C. 1271 et seq.), $4,179,000.

SEC. 3. AMENDMENTS TO TITLE IX OF THE MERCHANT MARINE ACT, 1936.

    (a) Title IX of the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 (46 App. U.S.C. 101 
et seq.) is amended by adding after section 902 the following:

``SEC. 903. DOCUMENTATION OF CERTAIN DRY CARGO VESSELS.

    ``The restrictions of section 901(b)(1) of this Act concerning a 
vessel built in a foreign country shall not apply to a drybulk or 
breakbulk vessel over 7,500 deadweight tons that has been delivered 
from a foreign shipyard or contracted for construction in a foreign 
shipyard within either 1 year of the date of enactment of this section, 
or, no later than the effective date of the OECD Shipbuilding Trade 
Agreement Act, whichever occurs earlier. A vessel timely contracted for 
or delivered pursuant to this section and documented under the laws of 
the United States shall be deemed to have been United States built for 
purposes of sections 901(b) and 901b of this Act: Provided, That (1) 
following delivery by a foreign shipyard, the vessel shall have any 
additional shipyard work necessary to receive a Coast Guard certificate 
of inspection performed in a United States shipyard; (2) the vessel is 
not documented in another country before being documented under the 
laws of the United States; (3) the vessel complies with the same 
inspection standards set forth for ocean common carriers in section 
1137 of the Coast Guard Authorization Act of 1996 (46 App. U.S.C. 1187 
note); (4) actual delivery of a vessel contracted for construction 
takes place on or before the 3-year anniversary of the date of the 
contract to construct the vessel; and (5) the provisions of section 
9(e) of the Shipping Act, 1916, as amended on October 19, 1996, shall 
not apply to a vessel built pursuant to this section.''.
    (b) Section 901b(c)(2) of the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 (46 U.S.C. 
App. 1241f(c)(2)) is amended by striking ``1986.'' and inserting 
``1986, the 18-month period commencing April 1, 2000, and the 12-month 
period beginning on the first day of October in the year 2001 and each 
year thereafter.''.

SEC. 4. AMENDMENT RELATING TO DISPOSAL OF OBSOLETE VESSELS FROM THE 
              NATIONAL DEFENSE RESERVE FLEET.

    Section 6(c)(1)(A) of the National Maritime Heritage Act of 1994 
(Public Law 103-451; 108 Stat. 4776; 16 U.S.C. 5405) is amended by 
striking out ``2001'' and inserting in lieu thereof ``2006''.
                                 &lt;all&gt;