Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/17/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/17/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/17/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/17/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/17/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/17/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/25/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/15/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/15/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/22/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/22/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/22/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/22/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/29/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/29/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/13/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/20/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/29/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/29/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/29/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/16/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/30/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/21/1999