Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/09/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/09/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/17/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/17/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/17/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/17/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/19/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/19/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/23/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/23/2000
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/24/2000
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 05/24/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/24/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/24/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/24/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/25/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/06/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/08/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/08/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/14/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/21/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/22/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/22/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/14/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/06/2000